MS SB2154 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-09 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-09 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 37-147-11, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Extend The Eligibility For An Exemption Under The Mississippi University Research Authority Act To University Officers Or Employees Who Make Valuable Contributions To The Commercialization Of University Technologies; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Mississippi University Research Authority Act; extend eligibility for an exemption to certain university officers or employees.
Sponsors
Sen. John Polk [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-26 - House - House Passed (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-09 | Approved by Governor | |
2015-03-03 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2015-02-27 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2015-02-26 | House | Passed |
2015-02-25 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2015-02-24 | House | Referred To Universities and Colleges |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Passed |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2015-01-09 | Senate | Referred To Universities and Colleges |