MS SB2154 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-04 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-04 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Sections 27-69-53, 27-69-55 And 27-69-59, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Modify The Procedure For Forfeiture And Disposal Of Contraband Tobacco; To Provide The Procedure For The Sale Of Tobacco That Is Forfeited; To Provide For The Payment Of Taxes By The Purchaser Of Such Tobacco; To Authorize The Destruction Of Forfeited Contraband Tobacco If It Is Unable To Be Sold; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Contraband tobacco; modify procedure for confiscation, forfeiture and disposal of.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-06 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-04 | House | Died In Committee |
2014-02-14 | House | Referred To Ways and Means |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Passed |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2014-01-10 | Senate | Referred To Finance |