MS SB2150 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-28 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-28 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Designate The Mississippi Wildlife Heritage Museum In Leland, Mississippi, As The Official State Wildlife Heritage Museum; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Mississippi Wildlife Heritage Museum in Leland; designate as the official state wildlife heritage museum.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-17 - House - House Passed (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-28 | Approved by Governor | |
2016-03-22 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2016-03-18 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2016-03-17 | House | Passed |
2016-03-17 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2016-03-17 | House | DR - TSDP: WI To RU |
2016-03-15 | House | DR - TSDP: RU To WI |
2016-03-14 | House | Referred To Rules;Wildlife, Fisheries and Parks |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Passed |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Referred To Rules |