MS SB2131 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 36-16)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-06-04 - Title Suff Do Pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 7-3-7, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That The Official Seal Used By The Secretary Of State Shall Contain The Words "in God We Trust" At The Bottom Of The Seal; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Secretary of State's official seal; include the phrase "In God We Trust" at the bottom.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-04HouseTitle Suff Do Pass
2020-03-25HouseReferred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency
2020-03-12SenateTransmitted To House
2020-03-10SenatePassed As Amended
2020-03-10SenateAmended
2020-02-25SenateTitle Suff Do Pass
2020-01-23SenateReferred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback