MS SB2123 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-08 - Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act Entitled The "mississippi Correctional Safety And Rehabilitation Act Of 2020"; To Amend Section 47-7-3, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Prescribe Conditions For Parole Eligibility And To Provide Limitations On Inmate Eligibility To Petition The Sentencing Court For Parole Eligibility If The Inmate Is Serving A Sentence For A Crime Of Violence Or Nonviolence; To Reenact And Amend Section 47-7-3.1, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide For Inmate Case Planning And To Prescribe Dates For The Mississippi Department Of Corrections To Complete Case Plans For Parole-eligible Inmates To Ensure That The Plan Is Achievable; To Reenact And Amend Section 47-7-3.2, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide A Minimum Time Offenders Convicted Of A Crime Of Violence Must Serve Before Release And A Minimum Percentage Of Other Sentences Other Offenders Must Serve Before Release; To Amend Section 47-7-5, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require An Affirmative Vote Of At Least Three Members Of The Mississippi Parole Board To Grant Parole To An Inmate Convicted Of A Crime Of Violence After June 30 1995; To Amend Section 47-7-13, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require An Affirmative Vote Of At Least Four Members Of The Mississippi Parole Board To Grant Parole To A Sex Offender; To Amend Section 47-7-15, Mississippi Code Of 1972, In Conformity; To Amend Section 47-7-17, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That The Victim Or Designated Family Member Shall Be Provided An Opportunity To Be Heard By The Parole Board Prior To A Parole Decision; To Amend Section 47-7-18, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require Certain Parole Hearings For Sex Offenders; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

"Mississippi Correctional Safety and Rehabilitation Act of 2020"; enact.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-30 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 25 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-30 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 80 N: 25 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 80 N: 25 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 32 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-08 Vetoed
2020-07-02HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2020-07-02SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2020-07-01SenateMotion to Reconsider W/Drawn
2020-07-01SenateMotion to Reconsider Entered
2020-06-30SenateConference Report Adopted
2020-06-30HouseConference Report Adopted
2020-06-29HouseConference Report Filed
2020-06-29SenateConference Report Filed
2020-06-19HouseConferees Named Bain,Horan,Roberson
2020-06-17SenateConferees Named Wiggins,Sparks,Barnett
2020-06-16SenateDecline to Concur/Invite Conf
2020-06-12HouseReturned For Concurrence
2020-06-12HouseMotion to Reconsider Tabled
2020-06-11HouseMotion to Reconsider Entered (Hobgood-Wilkes, Bain, Sanford)
2020-06-11HousePassed As Amended
2020-06-11HouseAmended
2020-06-03HouseTitle Suff Do Pass As Amended
2020-06-03HouseDR - TSDPAA: CN To JB
2020-06-02HouseDR - TSDPAA: JB To CN
2020-03-25HouseReferred To Judiciary B;Corrections
2020-03-16SenateTransmitted To House
2020-03-12SenatePassed As Amended
2020-03-12SenateAmended
2020-03-12SenateCommittee Substitute Adopted
2020-02-25SenateTitle Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
2020-02-25SenateDR - TSDPCS: JB To CR
2020-01-23SenateReferred To Judiciary, Division B;Corrections

Mississippi State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2020/pdf/history/SB/SB2123.xml
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2020/html/SB/2100-2199/SB2123IN.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2020/html/SB/2100-2199/SB2123CS.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2020/html/SB/2100-2199/SB2123PS.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2020/html/SB/2100-2199/SB2123SG.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2020/html/sam/SB2123_S_(Cmte_Sub)_Amend_01.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2020/html/sam/SB2123_S_(Cmte_Sub)_Amend_02.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2020/html/ham/SB2123_H_Cmte_Amend_01.htm
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2020/pdf/votes/senate/0660007.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2020/pdf/votes/house/1570014.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2020/pdf/votes/house/1760010.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2020/pdf/votes/senate/1760026.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback