MS SB2117 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 73-50-1, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Provisions Applicable To The Issuance Of Occupational Licenses To Applicants Who Are Members Of The Military Or Married To Or Dependents Of Members Of The Military, To Make It Easier And Faster For Those Applicants To Receive Occupational Licenses In Mississippi; To Provide That This Section Shall Be Known As The "military Family Freedom Act"; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Occupational licensing boards; require prompt licensure and temporary practice permits for certain military applicants.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-18 - Senate - Senate Concurred in Amend From House (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-12 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-29 Approved by Governor
2020-06-23HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2020-06-23SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2020-06-18SenateConcurred in Amend From House
2020-06-16HouseReturned For Concurrence
2020-06-12HousePassed As Amended
2020-06-12HouseAmended
2020-06-09HouseTitle Suff Do Pass As Amended
2020-03-17HouseReferred To Military Affairs
2020-03-10SenateTransmitted To House
2020-03-09SenatePassed
2020-03-09SenateCommittee Substitute Adopted
2020-02-18SenateTitle Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
2020-01-20SenateReferred To Veterans and Military Affairs

Mississippi State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2020/pdf/history/SB/SB2117.xml
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2020/html/SB/2100-2199/SB2117IN.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2020/html/SB/2100-2199/SB2117CS.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2020/html/SB/2100-2199/SB2117PS.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2020/html/SB/2100-2199/SB2117SG.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2020/html/ham/SB2117_H_Cmte_Amend_01.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2020/html/ham/SB2117_H_Amend_01_to_Amend_01.htm
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2020/pdf/votes/senate/0630005.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2020/pdf/votes/house/1580009.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2020/pdf/votes/senate/1640019.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback