MS SB2117 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Failed on April 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-02 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Failed on April 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-02 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Establish A Mississippi Qualified Health Center/rural Health Clinic Incubator Grant Program In The State Department Of Health For The Purpose Of Making Competitive Grants To Such Centers To Increase Access To Care To Uninsured Or Medically Indigent Patients In Mississippi; To Prescribe Requirements For Participation In The Program And Restrictions On The Use Of Such Grants; To Create The Mississippi Qualified Health Center/rural Health Clinic Incubator Grant Program Fund In The State Treasury; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Mississippi Qualified Health Center/Rural Health Clinic Incubator Grant Program; establish in the State Department of Health.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-06 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-02 | Senate | Died On Calendar |
2014-03-31 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2014-03-21 | House | Conferees Named Mims,Barker,Brown (20th) |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Conferees Named Kirby,Burton,Bryan |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2014-03-07 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2014-03-06 | House | Passed As Amended |
2014-03-06 | House | Amended |
2014-02-26 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2014-02-26 | House | DR - TSDPAA: AP To PH |
2014-02-25 | House | DR - TSDPAA: PH To AP |
2014-02-14 | House | Referred To Public Health and Human Services;Appropriations |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Entered |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Passed |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2014-01-29 | Senate | DR - TSDPCS: PH To AP |
2014-01-10 | Senate | Referred To Public Health and Welfare;Appropriations |