MS SB2116 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-17 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-17 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 23-15-895, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Extend The Prohibition On Electioneering Activities To All Persons Within The Polling Place And In Any Public Area That Is Within A Set Distance Of The Polling Place; To Define The Activities Which Constitute Electioneering; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Electioneering; prohibit for all persons in any public area within a set distance of polling place.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-17 | House | Died On Calendar |
2020-06-04 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2020-03-25 | House | Referred To Apportionment and Elections |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Amended |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2020-01-20 | Senate | Referred To Elections |