MS SB2116 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Create New Section 41-41-34.1, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Prohibit An Abortion Of An Unborn Human Individual With A Detectable Fetal Heartbeat Except To Prevent The Death Of The Pregnant Woman Or To Prevent A Serious Risk Of The Substantial And Irreversible Impairment Of A Major Bodily Function Of The Woman; To Amend Section 73-25-29, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That A Physician Performing An Abortion On A Pregnant Woman After Determining That The Unborn Human Individual Has A Detectable Fetal Heartbeat Is Subject To License Revocation Or Disciplinary Action; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Abortion; prohibit an abortion of an unborn human individual with a detectable heartbeat.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Concurred in Amend From House (Y: 34 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 76 N: 37 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 34 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-21 Approved by Governor
2019-03-20HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2019-03-20SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2019-03-19SenateConcurred in Amend From House
2019-03-12HouseReturned For Concurrence
2019-03-12HouseMotion to Reconsider Tabled
2019-03-11HouseMotion to Reconsider Entered (Dortch, Mims, Johnson (87th))
2019-03-11HousePassed As Amended
2019-03-11HouseAmended
2019-03-05HouseRead the Third Time
2019-02-27HouseTitle Suff Do Pass As Amended
2019-02-20HouseReferred To Public Health and Human Services
2019-02-14SenateTransmitted To House
2019-02-13SenatePassed
2019-02-13SenateAmendment Failed
2019-02-05SenateTitle Suff Do Pass
2019-01-11SenateReferred To Public Health and Welfare

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback