MS SB2116 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-28 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-28 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 97-3-19, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Include Murder Of A Witness, Potential Witness Or Confidential Informant As A Capital Offense; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Obstruction of justice; revise elements of offense and punishment therefor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 46 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-28 | House | Died In Committee |
2017-02-21 | House | Referred To Judiciary B |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Passed |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division A |