MS SB2116 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-10 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-10 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize The Mississippi Board Of Mental Health, Acting Through The Mississippi Department Of Mental Health, To Sell To The Clarke College Alumni Association Certain Real Property Located In Newton County, Mississippi, For Use As A Clarke College Alumni House; To Name The Basketball Court Within The Davey L. Whitney Complex Located On The Campus Of Alcorn State University In Lorman, Mississippi, The Shirley A. Walker Basketball Court; And For Related Purposes.
Title
MS Dept. of Mental Health; may sell to Clarke College Alumni Assn. certain real property in Newton County.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-01 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-10 | Approved by Governor | |
2014-04-07 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2014-04-01 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2014-03-31 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2014-03-27 | House | Conferees Named Weathersby,Read,Sullivan |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Conferees Named Blount,Doty,Harkins |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2014-03-13 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2014-03-11 | House | Passed As Amended |
2014-03-11 | House | Amended |
2014-03-11 | House | Reconsidered |
2014-03-05 | House | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Miles, Weathersby, Coleman (65th)) |
2014-03-05 | House | Passed As Amended |
2014-03-05 | House | Amended |
2014-02-25 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2014-02-15 | House | Referred To Public Property |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Passed |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2014-02-03 | Senate | DR - TSDPCS: PP To PH |
2014-01-10 | Senate | Referred To Public Property;Public Health and Welfare |