MS SB2113 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 24-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Create New Section 37-13-2, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That No Public Institution Of Higher Learning, Community/junior College, School District Or Charter School Shall Direct Or Compel Students To Affirm That Any Sex, Race, Ethnicity, Religion Or National Origin Is Inherently Superior, Or That Individuals Should Be Adversely Treated Based On Such Characteristics; To Provide That No Distinction Or Classification Of Students Shall Be Made On Account Of Race Other Than The Required Collection Or Reporting Of Demographic Information; To Provide That No Course Of Instruction Shall Be Taught That Affirms Such Principles; To Provide That No Funds Shall Be Expended By The State Department Of Education, Any Entity Under The Department's Jurisdiction, School Districts, Charter Schools, Community/junior Colleges, The Mississippi Community College Board, The Board Of Trustees Of State Institutions Of Higher Learning Or Public Institutions Of Higher Learning For Any Purpose That Would Violate This Act; To Provide For The Severability Of The Act; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Critical Race Theory; prohibit.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-03-03 - House - House Passed (Y: 75 N: 43 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-21 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-03-14 Approved by Governor
2022-03-11HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2022-03-11SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2022-03-09HouseReturned For Enrolling
2022-03-09HouseMotion to Reconsider Tabled
2022-03-03HouseMotion to Reconsider Entered (Hines, Huddleston, Scoggin)
2022-03-03HousePassed
2022-03-01HouseRead the Third Time
2022-02-28HouseTitle Suff Do Pass
2022-02-24HouseReferred To Universities and Colleges
2022-01-24SenateTransmitted To House
2022-01-21SenatePassed
2022-01-21SenateCommittee Substitute Adopted
2022-01-20SenateTitle Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
2022-01-12SenateReferred To Education

Mississippi State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2022/pdf/history/SB/SB2113.xml
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2022/html/SB/2100-2199/SB2113IN.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2022/html/SB/2100-2199/SB2113CS.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2022/html/SB/2100-2199/SB2113PS.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2022/html/SB/2100-2199/SB2113SG.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2022/html/ham/SB2113_H_Amend_01.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2022/html/ham/SB2113_H_Amend_02.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2022/html/ham/SB2113_H_Amend_03.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2022/html/ham/SB2113_H_Amend_04.pdf
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2022/html/ham/SB2113_H_Amend_05.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2022/html/ham/SB2113_H_Amend_06.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2022/html/ham/SB2113_H_Amend_07.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2022/html/ham/SB2113_H_Amend_08.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2022/html/ham/SB2113_H_Amend_09.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2022/html/ham/SB2113_H_Amend_10.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2022/html/ham/SB2113_H_Amend_11.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2022/html/ham/SB2113_H_Amend_12.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2022/html/ham/SB2113_H_Amend_13.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2022/html/ham/SB2113_H_Amend_14.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2022/html/ham/SB2113_H_Amend_15.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2022/html/ham/SB2113_H_Amend_16.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2022/html/ham/SB2113_H_Amend_17.htm
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2022/pdf/votes/senate/0180002.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2022/pdf/votes/house/0590023.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback