MS SB2113 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-15 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Require The Secretary Of State To Adopt And Publish Testing Standards And Election Procedures That Meet Or Exceed The Standards Set By The United States Elections Assistance Commission; To Amend Section 23-15-507, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require All Omr Equipment To Be Certified By The United States Elections Assistance Commission; To Amend Section 23-15-531.1, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require All Dre Units To Be Certified By The United States Elections Assistance Commission; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Voting equipment; require certification by the United States Election Assistance Commission.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-15SenateDied On Calendar
2021-02-05SenateMotion to Reconsider Entered
2021-02-04SenatePassed
2021-02-04SenateCommittee Substitute Adopted
2021-01-26SenateTitle Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
2021-01-08SenateReferred To Elections

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2315507Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2315531Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback