MS SB2108 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-13 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-13 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize Hospitals To Provide Each Patient Or The Patient's Legal Guardian An Opportunity To Designate A Lay Caregiver After The Patient's Admission Into A Hospital And Before The Patient's Discharge To The Patient's Residence; To Provide That Designation Of A Lay Caregiver By A Patient Or A Patient's Legal Guardian Does Not Obligate Any Individual To Perform Any Aftercare Tasks For The Patient; To Provide That If A Patient Or The Patient's Guardian Has Designated A Lay Caregiver, A Hospital Shall Notify The Designated Lay Caregiver Of The Patient's Discharge To The Patient's Residence Or Transfer To Another Licensed Facility As Soon As Practicable; To Provide That If The Hospital Is Unable To Contact The Designated Lay Caregiver, The Lack Of Contact Shall Not Interfere With, Delay Or Otherwise Affect The Medical Care Provided To The Patient, Or An Appropriate Discharge Of The Patient; To Require The Hospital To Make A Reasonable Number Of Attempts To Consult With The Designated Lay Caregiver To Prepare Him Or Her For Aftercare And Issue A Discharge Plan Describing A Patient's Aftercare Needs; To Provide That If The Hospital Is Unable To Contact The Designated Lay Caregiver After A Reasonable Number Of Attempts, The Lack Of Contact Shall Not Interfere With, Delay Or Otherwise Affect An Appropriate Discharge Of The Patient; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Caregiver Advise, Record, Enable (CARE) Act; record family caregivers upon admission to hospital.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-31 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-13 | Approved by Governor | |
2015-04-06 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2015-03-31 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2015-03-28 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2015-03-28 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2015-03-27 | House | Conferees Named Mims,Barker,Brown (20th) |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Conferees Named Kirby,Burton,Frazier |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2015-03-05 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2015-03-04 | House | Passed As Amended |
2015-03-04 | House | Amended |
2015-02-26 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2015-02-24 | House | Referred To Public Health and Human Services |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Amended |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2015-01-09 | Senate | Referred To Public Health and Welfare |