MS SB2098 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 12 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-12 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 12 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-12 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 99-19-72, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Make A Technical Correction To The Filing Fee Charged By The Circuit Clerk For An Expunction; To Bring Forward Section 99-19-73, Mississippi Code Of 1972, For Purposes Of Amendment; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Criminal convictions; revise certain fees and assessments.
Sponsors
Sen. Giles Ward [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-07 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-12 | House | Died On Calendar |
2014-03-11 | House | Read the Third Time |
2014-02-27 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2014-02-14 | House | Referred To Judiciary B |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Passed |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2014-01-10 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division B |