MS SB2091 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-07 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 41-59-35, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize An Emergency Medical Technician Or Other Emergency Personnel To Transport A Police Dog Injured In The Line Of Duty To A Veterinary Clinic Or Hospital Emergency Department; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Emergency Medical Technicians; authorize to transport police dogs injured in the line of duty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-28 - House - House Passed (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 45 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-07 Approved by Governor
2018-03-02HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2018-03-02SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2018-03-01HouseReturned For Enrolling
2018-02-28HousePassed
2018-02-22HouseTitle Suff Do Pass
2018-02-19HouseReferred To Public Health and Human Services
2018-02-09SenateTransmitted To House
2018-02-09SenateMotion to Reconsider Tabled
2018-02-07SenateMotion to Reconsider Entered
2018-02-07SenatePassed
2018-01-24SenateTitle Suff Do Pass
2018-01-04SenateReferred To Public Health and Welfare

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback