MS SB2079 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-11 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Create New Section 45-9-181, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Enact The Mississippi School Safety Guardian Act; To Define Terms; To Establish The School Safety Guardian Training Program Within The Office Of Homeland Security Within The Department Of Public Safety; To Authorize The Governing Body Of A School To Establish A School Safety Guardian Program; To Provide Civil Immunity Under Certain Circumstances For School Safety Guardians Who Comply With The Act; To Exempt The Identity Of School Safety Guardians From Public Disclosure; To Provide Minimum Requirement For The Training Program; To Enact Standards; To Provide That Subject To Appropriation And Any Other Requirements Provided By Law, The Office Of Homeland Security May Contract With A Third-party Vendor For Mobile Phone Applications And/or Computer Equipment Or Services To Accomplish The Purposes Of This Act; To Amend Section 45-1-2, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Direct The Commissioner To Establish Guidelines For Active Shooter Situations; To Amend Section 97-3-15, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform The Instances Of Justifiable Homicide; To Amend Section 97-37-9, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform The Defenses To A Charge Of Unlawfully Carrying Of A Concealed Weapon; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MS School Safety Guardian Act; create.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-27 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 38 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 79 N: 32 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-07 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 79 N: 35 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 39 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 38 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-11 Approved by Governor
2023-03-31HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2023-03-31SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2023-03-27HouseConference Report Adopted
2023-03-27SenateConference Report Adopted
2023-03-26HouseConference Report Filed
2023-03-26SenateConference Report Filed
2023-03-22HouseConferees Named Bain,Horan,Ford (73rd)
2023-03-17SenateConferees Named DeBar,Hill,Polk
2023-03-15SenateDecline to Concur/Invite Conf
2023-03-08HouseReturned For Concurrence
2023-03-07HousePassed As Amended
2023-03-07HouseAmended
2023-02-23HouseTitle Suff Do Pass As Amended
2023-02-20HouseReferred To Judiciary B
2023-02-09SenateTransmitted To House
2023-02-08SenatePassed
2023-02-08SenateCommittee Substitute Adopted
2023-01-31SenateTitle Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
2023-01-31SenateDR - TSDPCS: ED To JA
2023-01-09SenateReferred To Education;Judiciary, Division A

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4512Amended CodeSee Bill Text
97315Amended CodeSee Bill Text
97379Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Mississippi State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2023/pdf/history/SB/SB2079.xml
Texthttps://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2023/html/SB/2001-2099/SB2079IN.htm
Texthttps://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2023/html/SB/2001-2099/SB2079CS.htm
Texthttps://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2023/html/SB/2001-2099/SB2079PS.htm
Texthttps://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2023/html/SB/2001-2099/SB2079SG.htm
Amendmenthttps://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2023/html/ham/SB2079_H_Cmte_Amend_01.htm
Amendmenthttps://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2023/html/ham/SB2079_H_Amend_01_to_Amend_01.htm
Amendmenthttps://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2023/html/ham/SB2079_H_Amend_02_to_Amend_01.htm
Roll Callhttps://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2023/pdf/votes/senate/0370069.pdf
Roll Callhttps://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2023/pdf/votes/senate/0370070.pdf
Roll Callhttps://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2023/pdf/votes/house/0640007.pdf
Roll Callhttps://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2023/pdf/votes/house/0840028.pdf
Roll Callhttps://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2023/pdf/votes/senate/0840043.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback