MS SB2076 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-17 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-17 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Reenact Sections 69-5-1, 69-5-3, 69-5-7, 69-5-8, 69-5-11, 69-5-13, 69-5-15, 69-5-27, 69-5-29 And 69-5-31, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Abolish The State Fair Commission And Transfer Its Functions And Responsibilities To The Department Of Agriculture And Commerce; To Amend Reenacted Section 69-5-1, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Add An Additional Member To The Mississippi Fair Advisory Council; To Repeal Section 69-5-33, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Remove The Repealer On Those Sections Of Law; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Mississippi Fair Commission; remove repealer and revise advisory council composition.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-09 - House - House Passed (Y: 119 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-17 | Approved by Governor | |
2021-03-12 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2021-03-10 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2021-03-09 | House | Passed |
2021-03-02 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2021-02-24 | House | Referred To Agriculture |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Passed |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2021-01-07 | Senate | Referred To Agriculture |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
69 | 5 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
69 | 5 | 11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
69 | 5 | 13 | New Code | See Bill Text |
69 | 5 | 15 | New Code | See Bill Text |
69 | 5 | 27 | New Code | See Bill Text |
69 | 5 | 29 | New Code | See Bill Text |
69 | 5 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
69 | 5 | 31 | New Code | See Bill Text |
69 | 5 | 33 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
69 | 5 | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
69 | 5 | 8 | New Code | See Bill Text |