MS SB2068 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-13 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-13 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 43-3-103, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Delete The Provision Providing That The Compensation Of The Executive Director Of The Mississippi Industries For The Blind Is Subject To The Approval Of The State Personnel Board; And For Related Purposes.
Title
MS Industries for the Blind; remove provision requiring salary of director to be subject to the State Personnel Board.
Sponsors
Sen. Terry Brown [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-02-13 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 43 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-13 | House | Died On Calendar |
2013-03-05 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2013-03-05 | House | DR - TSDP: AP To FS |
2013-02-28 | House | DR - TSDP: FS To AP |
2013-02-21 | House | Referred To Fees and Salaries of Public Officers;Appropriations |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Passed |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2013-01-31 | Senate | DR - TSDP: AC To AP |
2013-01-14 | Senate | Referred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency;Appropriations |