MS SB2066 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-28 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-28 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 25-3-35, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Increase The Annual Salaries Of District Attorneys; To Amend Section 25-31-10, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Increase The Maximum Salary Paid To A Criminal Investigator In The Office Of The District Attorney; And For Related Purposes.
Title
District attorneys and investigators; increase annual salaries of.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-08 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 105 N: 10 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 46 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 46 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-28 | Senate | Died In Conference |
2022-03-24 | House | Conferees Named Bain,Sanford,Oliver |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Conferees Named Polk,Blackwell,Hopson |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2022-03-09 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2022-03-08 | House | Passed As Amended |
2022-03-08 | House | Amended |
2022-03-01 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2022-03-01 | House | DR - TSDPAA: AP To JB |
2022-02-22 | House | DR - TSDPAA: JB To AP |
2022-02-10 | House | Referred To Judiciary B;Appropriations |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Passed |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2022-01-06 | Senate | Referred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
25 | 3 | 35 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
25 | 31 | 10 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |