MS SB2064 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-09 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-09 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 25-31-39, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide For The Appointment And Employment Of Part-time Legal Assistants By A District Attorney, Subject To The Availability Of Funds; And For Related Purposes.
Title
District attorneys; provide for the appointment of part-time legal assistants.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-09 | House | Died On Calendar |
2022-02-23 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2022-02-09 | House | Referred To Judiciary A |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Amended |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2022-01-06 | Senate | Referred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency |