MS SB2056 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Create The Uniform Premarital Agreement Act; To Authorize Agreements Between Prospective Spouses Made In Contemplation Of Marriage; To Specify The Matters With Respect To Which Parties May Contract In Premarital Agreements; To Specify The Effective Date Of A Premarital Agreement And The Manner In Which Such An Agreement May Be Amended Or Revoked; To Specify Conditions Under Which A Premarital Agreement Is Not Enforceable; To Provide An Exception For Persons Aged 65 Years Or Older; To Amend Sections 93-3-7, 93-5-2 And 93-5-23, Mississippi Code Of 1972, In Conformity Thereto; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Uniform Premarital Agreement Act; enact.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-03 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-02 | Died In Committee | |
2010-02-11 | Referred To Judiciary A | |
2010-02-04 | Transmitted To House | |
2010-02-03 | Passed | |
2010-01-26 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2010-01-06 | Referred To Judiciary, Division A |