MS SB2053 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on March 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Require The Board Of Trustees Of State Institutions Of Higher Learning And The Mississippi Community College Board To Adopt Policies Requiring The Award Of Educational Credits For Courses That Are Part Of A Student's Military Training Or Service; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Institutions of higher learning/community colleges; require the award of educational credits for military training or service.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-12 - House - House Passed (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-28 Approved by Governor
2019-03-21HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2019-03-21SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2019-03-13HouseReturned For Enrolling
2019-03-12HousePassed
2019-02-27HouseTitle Suff Do Pass
2019-02-19HouseReferred To Universities and Colleges
2019-02-13SenateTransmitted To House
2019-02-12SenatePassed
2019-02-12SenateCommittee Substitute Adopted
2019-01-30SenateTitle Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
2019-01-08SenateReferred To Universities and Colleges

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback