MS SB2053 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 16 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-16 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 16 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-16 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 27-65-105, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Clarify From Whom Payments For Home Medical Equipment And Home Medical Supplies May Be Made In Order For The Sale To Be Exempt From Sales Taxation; To Exempt From Sales Taxation Sales Of Tangible Personal Property, Labor, Services Or Products To Schools And School Districts Under A Program That Is Administered By Or Coordinated With An Agency, Commission, Department Or Other Instrumentality Of The United States Government When Payment For The Tangible Personal Property, Labor, Services Or Products Is Made By Or Through A Nonprofit Organization Or Other Entity Established By Or For The Benefit Of The Agency, Commission, Department Or Other Instrumentality Of The United States Government Administering Or Coordinating Such Program; To Amend Section 27-65-111, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That The Sales Tax Exemption For Durable Medical Equipment And Home Medical Supplies Shall Include The Same Type Of Equipment Listed Under The Medicare And Medicaid Programs And Certain Other Equipment And To Clarify From Whom Payments For Home Medical Equipment And Home Medical Supplies May Be Made In Order For The Sale To Be Exempt From Sales Taxation; To Exempt From Sales Taxation Sales Of Tangible Personal Property Or Services To Any Subsidiary Or Affiliate Of The Mississippi Children's Museum Operating A Satellite Or Branch Museum In This State; To Exempt From Sales Taxation Sales Of Feminine Hygiene Products; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Sales taxation; revise exemption for durable medical equipment and home medical supplies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-04 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 102 N: 12 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-16 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-16 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-16 | Senate | Died On Calendar |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Conferees Named Fillingane,Kirby,Chassaniol |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2016-04-05 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2016-04-05 | House | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2016-04-04 | House | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Sykes, Smith, Lamar) |
2016-04-04 | House | Passed As Amended |
2016-04-04 | House | Amended |
2016-04-04 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2016-04-01 | House | Referred To Ways and Means |
2016-03-18 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Amended |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Referred To Finance |