MS SB2034 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-13 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-13 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 91-7-63, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That Letters Of Administration Shall Be Granted By The Chancery Court Of The County In Which The Intestate Owned Land If The Intestate Had No Fixed Place Of Residence; To Remove The Provision Of Law That Provided For Letters Of Administration To Be Issued By The Chancery Court In The County In Which The Intestate Had Personal Property; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Intestacy; revise provisions for venue.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-29 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-13 | Approved by Governor | |
2022-04-04 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2022-03-29 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2022-03-28 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2022-03-26 | House | Conferees Named Cockerham,Reynolds,McKnight |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Conferees Named Wiggins,McCaughn,Simmons (12th) |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2022-03-11 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2022-03-09 | House | Passed As Amended |
2022-03-09 | House | Amended |
2022-03-08 | House | Read the Third Time |
2022-02-23 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2022-02-09 | House | Referred To Judiciary A |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Passed |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2022-01-06 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division A |