MS SB2033 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-3)
Status: Failed on March 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-09 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-3)
Status: Failed on March 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-09 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 43-13-115, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize And Direct The Division Of Medicaid To Provide Up To 12 Months Of Continuous Coverage Postpartum For Any Individual Who Qualifies For Medicaid As A Pregnant Woman To The Extent Allowable Under Federal Law; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Recipients of Medicaid; extend postpartum coverage up to 12 months.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 46 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-09 | House | Died On Calendar |
2022-03-08 | House | Read the Third Time |
2022-03-01 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2022-02-08 | House | Referred To Medicaid |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Entered |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Passed |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2022-01-06 | Senate | Referred To Medicaid |