MS SB2024 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-09 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 27-105-305, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide County Boards Of Supervisors The Discretion To Determine The Interval Of Time For Providing Notice To Financial Institutions Of The Opening Of The Bidding Process For Serving As Depositories Of County Funds; To Clarify That The Selection Of Depositories Is To Be Based Upon All Relevant Factors; To Amend Section 31-7-13, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That Reverse Auctions Shall Not Be Used For Certain Term Contracts; To Require The Clerk Of The Board Of Supervisors To Enter The Recommended Year-end Adjusting Accounting Entries Into The County's Accounting System And To Require The Board Of Supervisors To Spread The Reason That Any Recommended Entry Was Not Entered Upon Its Minutes If The Clerk Of The Board Of Supervisors Declines To Make The Entry; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Depositories; revise bid process for selection by counties and municipalities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-27 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-27 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 114 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 110 N: 6 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - House - House Passed (Y: 109 N: 3 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-09 Approved by Governor
2021-03-31HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2021-03-31SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2021-03-27SenateConference Report Adopted
2021-03-27HouseConference Report Adopted
2021-03-26HouseConference Report Filed
2021-03-26SenateConference Report Filed
2021-03-22HouseConferees Named Byrd,Taylor,Smith
2021-03-16SenateConferees Named Hill,Whaley,Seymour
2021-03-11SenateDecline to Concur/Invite Conf
2021-03-10HouseReturned For Concurrence
2021-03-09HousePassed As Amended
2021-03-09HouseAmended
2021-03-09HouseReconsidered
2021-02-26HouseMotion to Reconsider Entered (Byrd, Taylor, Hood)
2021-02-26HousePassed
2021-02-25HouseTitle Suff Do Pass
2021-02-24HouseReferred To County Affairs
2021-02-08SenateTransmitted To House
2021-02-05SenatePassed
2021-02-01SenateTitle Suff Do Pass
2021-01-05SenateReferred To County Affairs

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
27105305Amended CodeSee Bill Text
31713Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback