MS SB2022 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Conferees Named Horan,Owen,Hall
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Conferees Named Horan,Owen,Hall
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Sections 97-3-21 And 99-19-101, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide Alternative Sentencing Options For Juvenile Offenders In Compliance With United States Supreme Court Holdings In The Cases Of Miller V. Alabama And Roper V. Simmons; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Juvenile offenders; provide alternative sentencing and parole options.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-03 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 107 N: 3 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 38 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 38 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | House | Conferees Named Horan,Owen,Hall |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Conferees Named Fillingane,Sparks,Wiggins |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2024-04-04 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2024-04-03 | House | Passed As Amended |
2024-04-03 | House | Amended |
2024-03-27 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2024-03-18 | House | Referred To Judiciary B |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Passed |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2024-01-15 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division B |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
97 | 3 | 21 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
99 | 19 | 101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |