MS SB2022 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-23 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-23 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 97-29-61, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Prohibit "peeping Tom" Activities That Do Not Amount To Felonious Trespass; To Amend Section 97-29-63, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Prohibit Surreptitious Photography Of A Person's Body Or Underclothing Under Circumstances In Which A Person Would Reasonably Expect To Not Be The Subject Of Such Photography; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Voyeurism; prohibit lewd surreptitious viewing and photography.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-31 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 115 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 117 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 115 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 117 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-23 | Approved by Governor | |
2015-04-07 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2015-03-31 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2015-03-29 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2015-03-29 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2015-03-29 | House | Conferees Named Gipson,Campbell,Morgan |
2015-03-28 | Senate | Conferees Named Bryan,Wiggins,Hopson |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2015-03-11 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2015-03-10 | House | Passed As Amended |
2015-03-10 | House | Amended |
2015-03-03 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2015-02-26 | House | Referred To Judiciary B |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Passed |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2015-01-09 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division B |