MS SB2021 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-08 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-08 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 41-20-3, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That The Coordinator Of Mental Health Accessibility Shall Be Housed Within The Department Of Finance And Administration; To Provide That All Expenses Of The Coordinator Shall Be Paid Out Of Funds Appropriated To The Department Of Finance And Administration; To Amend Section 41-20-7, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That The Coordinator May Hire Staff Subject To The Approval Of The Executive Director Of The Department Of Finance And Administration; To Amend Section 27-104-7, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Exempt Any Personal Service Contracts Entered Into By The Coordinator Of Mental Health Accessibility Through June 30, 2022, From The Rules And Regulations Of The Personal Service Contract Review Board; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Coordinator of Mental Health Accessibility; house position under DFA, exempt contracts from rules of contract review board.
Sponsors
Sen. Hob Bryan [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-03 - House - House Passed (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-11 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-11 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-08 | Approved by Governor | |
2021-02-05 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2021-02-04 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2021-02-03 | House | Passed |
2021-01-26 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2021-01-21 | House | Referred To Public Health and Human Services |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Amended |
2021-01-07 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2021-01-06 | Senate | DR - TSDP: PH To AC |
2021-01-05 | Senate | Referred To Public Health and Welfare;Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
27 | 104 | 7 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 20 | 3 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 20 | 7 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |