MS SB2015 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-4)
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-4)
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Prohibit Bullying Or Harassing Behavior In The Public Schools; To Define Bullying Or Harassing Behavior; To Define Hostile Environment And To Require All Local School Districts To Adopt A Policy Prohibiting Bullying And Harassing Behavior As Required By This Act; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Bullying or harassing behavior in the schools; prohibit.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-26 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-26 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-04 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 92 N: 28 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-04 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-26 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-04 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 92 N: 28 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-04 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-13 | Approved by Governor | |
2010-04-07 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-04-01 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-03-26 | Conference Report Adopted | |
2010-03-26 | Conference Report Adopted | |
2010-03-26 | Conference Report Filed | |
2010-03-26 | Conference Report Filed | |
2010-03-19 | Conferees Named Brown,Hines,Gardner | |
2010-03-17 | Conferees Named Carmichael,Wilemon,Flowers | |
2010-03-17 | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf | |
2010-03-12 | Returned For Concurrence | |
2010-03-11 | Motion to Reconsider Tabled | |
2010-03-04 | Motion to Reconsider Entered | |
2010-03-04 | Passed As Amended | |
2010-03-04 | Amended | |
2010-02-25 | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended | |
2010-02-09 | Referred To Education | |
2010-02-05 | Transmitted To House | |
2010-02-04 | Passed | |
2010-02-04 | Committee Substitute Adopted | |
2010-01-26 | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub | |
2010-01-05 | Referred To Education |