MS SB2012 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Reenact Sections 85-7-301, 85-7-303, 85-7-305, 85-7-307, 85-7-309, 85-7-311, 85-7-313 And 85-7-315, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Sections Constitute Article 19 Of Chapter 7, Title 85, Mississippi Code Of 1972, And Create A Lien On Causes Of Action Accruing To Certain Injured Persons For Uncompensated Traumatic Burn Care; To Repeal Section 85-7-317, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Is A Sunset Provision For Sections 85-7-301 Through 85-7-315; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Lien for burn care; delete repeal clause.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-11 - House - House Passed (Y: 108 N: 3 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-28 Approved by Governor
2019-03-21HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2019-03-21SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2019-03-12HouseReturned For Enrolling
2019-03-11HousePassed
2019-02-27HouseTitle Suff Do Pass
2019-02-19HouseReferred To Public Health and Human Services
2019-02-08SenateTransmitted To House
2019-02-07SenatePassed
2019-01-29SenateTitle Suff Do Pass
2019-01-08SenateReferred To Public Health and Welfare

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback