MS SB2004 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-03 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-03 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize The Governing Authorities Of The Town Of Duck Hill, Mississippi, To Levy A Tax Upon The Gross Proceeds Of The Sales Of Restaurants And Sales Of Prepared Food At Convenience Stores, Which Shall Be Used To Promote Tourism, Parks And Recreation Within The Town; To Provide For An Election On The Question Of Implementing The Tax; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Town of Duck Hill; authorize governing authorities to levy tourism tax.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-24 - House - House Passed (Y: 108 N: 6 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-03 | Approved by Governor | |
2023-03-27 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2023-03-24 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2023-03-24 | House | Immediate Release |
2023-03-24 | House | Passed |
2023-03-23 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2023-03-21 | House | Referred To Local and Private Legislation |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Passed |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2023-03-14 | Senate | DR - TSDP: LP To FI |
2023-01-04 | Senate | Referred To Local and Private;Finance |