MS SB2002 | 2024 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-01-22 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-01-22 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act Making An Additional Appropriation In The Sum Of $117,614,000.00 From The Project Poppy Fund To The Mississippi Development Authority For The Purpose Of Funding The Projects Defined In Section 57-75-5(f)(xxxii), Mississippi Code Of 1972, For The Period Beginning On July 1, 2023, And Ending June 30, 2024.
Title
Appropriation; additional to MDA for certain projects.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-18 - House - House Passed (Y: 117 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-22 | Approved by Governor | |
2024-01-18 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2024-01-18 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2024-01-18 | House | Immediate Release |
2024-01-18 | House | Passed |
2024-01-18 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2024-01-18 | House | Referred To Appropriations A |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Passed |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Referred To Appropriations |