MS SB2002 | 2018 | 1st Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-4)
Status: Passed on September 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-05 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act Amend Section 27-103-302, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That From And After September 1, 2018, All Bp Oil Spill Settlement Funds Received By The State Shall Be Deposited Into The State Bp Settlement Fund And The Gulf Coast Restoration Fund; To Create A Special Fund In The State Treasury To Be Designated As The "state Bp Settlement Fund"; To Create A Special Fund In The State Treasury To Be Designated As The "gulf Coast Restoration Fund" (gcrf); To Provide That Monies In The Gcrf Shall Be Used, Upon Appropriation By The Legislature, To Provide Assistance To Applicants Through Programs Or Projects Authorized By This Act; To Provide That Monies In The Gcrf Shall Be Used Only For Programs Or Projects That Are Located In The Gulf Coast Region As Defined In The Federal Restore Act; To Create The Gulf Coast Restoration Fund Advisory Board To Provide Advice To Mda When Reviewing Applications For Assistance Under This Act; To Provide That The Mississippi Development Authority (mda) Shall Be The Administrator Of The Gcrf; To Authorize Mda To Carry Out Any Powers And Duties Authorized In This Act And Provide That Mda Shall Handle All Of The Day-to-day Matters Relating To The Gcrf; To Limit The Amount Of The Annual Administration Expenses Of Mda In Carrying Out Its Duties Under This Act; To Specify The Applicants Who Are Eligible For Assistance Under This Act; To Provide That Mda Shall Establish Criteria, Rules And Procedures For Accepting And Reviewing Applications For Assistance Under This Act; To Provide That Mda Shall Review, Compile, And Score All Timely Received Applications And Shall Present The Applications And Its Recommendations For Assistance To Individual Projects To The Legislature No Later Than December 1 Of The Year; To Provide That The Legislature Shall Determine Individual Projects That Will Be Funded By Separate Line Items In An Appropriation Bill; To Provide That Applications For Assistance Will Be Received Through Web Portals Set Up By Mda; To Authorize Mda To Establish Programs For Making Loans, Loan Guarantees, Grants And Any Other Financial Assistance To Applicants Whose Projects Are Approved For Assistance; To Specify The Applicants Who Are Eligible For Assistance Under These Programs; To Provide That Mda Shall Establish Programs And An Application Process To Provide Assistance To Applicants Who Prioritize Certain Types Of Projects; To Provide That Assistance Provided Under This Act May Not Be Used To Finance 100% Of The Cost Of Any Project; To Provide That Contracts Executed By Mda With Recipients Of Assistance Under This Act Must Include Provisions Requiring A Performance Report On The Contracted Activities; To Provide For Financial Audits Of Recipients Of Assistance Under This Act And Provide For Performance Audits Of Mda's Administration Of The Gcrf Under This Act; To Require Mda To File An Annual Report With Certain Legislative Officials And Lbo That Includes Detailed Information Regarding Receipts And Expenditures Of The Funds Received And Provided As Assistance Under This Act; To Require The State Treasurer To Transfer A Certain Amount Of Funds From The Budget Contingency Fund To The 2018 Transportation And Infrastructure Improvements Fund, Mississippi Highway-railroad Grade Crossing Safety Account And The Mississippi Railroad Improvements Fund; To Amend Section 9, House Bill No. 1, First Extraordinary Session Of 2018, To Provide That Money In The 2018 Transportation And Infrastructure Improvements Fund, Shall Be Disbursed, In The Discretion Of The Department Of Finance And Administration, For Certain Projects; To Specify The Projects For Which Money May Be Disbursed; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

BP Settlement Funds; deposit into State BP Settlement Fund and Gulf Coast Restoration Fund.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-29 - House - House Passed (Y: 99 N: 11 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-28 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 42 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-05 Approved by Governor
2018-08-30HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2018-08-30SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2018-08-29HouseReturned For Enrolling
2018-08-29HouseImmediate Release
2018-08-29HousePassed
2018-08-29HousePoint of Order Withdrawn
2018-08-29HousePoint of Order Raised
2018-08-29HouseAmendment Failed
2018-08-29HouseTitle Suff Do Pass
2018-08-29HouseReferred To Appropriations
2018-08-29SenateTransmitted To House
2018-08-28SenateImmediate Release
2018-08-28SenatePassed As Amended
2018-08-28SenateAmended
2018-08-28SenateTitle Suff Do Pass As Amended
2018-08-28SenateReferred To Appropriations

Mississippi State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/20181E/pdf/history/SB/SB2002.xml
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/20181E/html/SB/2001-2099/SB2002IN.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/20181E/html/SB/2001-2099/SB2002PS.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/20181E/html/SB/2001-2099/SB2002SG.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/20181E/html/sam/SB2002_S_Cmte_Amend_01.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/20181E/html/sam/SB2002_S_Amend_02.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/20181E/html/sam/SB2002_S_Amend_03.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/20181E/html/ham/SB2002_H_Amend_01.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/20181E/html/ham/SB2002_H_Amend_02.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/20181E/html/ham/SB2002_H_Amend_03.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/20181E/html/ham/SB2002_H_Amend_04.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/20181E/html/ham/SB2002_H_Amend_05.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/20181E/html/ham/SB2002_H_Amend_06.pdf
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/20181E/html/ham/SB2002_H_Amend_07.htm
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/20181E/pdf/votes/senate/0060003.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/20181E/pdf/votes/house/0070008.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback