MS SB2001 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 34-16)
Status: Failed on March 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 37-19-7, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Minimum Teacher Salary Scale By Increasing The Minimum Salary; To Amend Section 37-21-7, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Increase The Minimum Annual Salary For Teacher Assistants; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Teachers' salaries; provide for increase.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-02HouseDied In Committee
2021-02-24HouseReferred To Education;Appropriations
2021-01-25SenateTransmitted To House
2021-01-21SenatePassed
2021-01-19SenateTitle Suff Do Pass
2021-01-13SenateDR - TSDP: ED To AP
2021-01-05SenateReferred To Education;Appropriations

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
37197Amended CodeSee Bill Text
37217Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback