MS SB2001 | 2014 | 1st Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 24 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-24 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act Making An Appropriation For The Support And Maintenance Of The Office Of State Aid Road Construction Of The Mississippi Department Of Transportation For Fiscal Year 2015.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriation; Transportation, Department of - State Aid Road Construction, Office of.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-04-02 - House - House Passed (Y: 121 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-24 Approved by Governor
2014-04-07HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2014-04-07SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2014-04-03HouseReturned For Enrolling
2014-04-02HouseImmediate Release
2014-04-02HousePassed
2014-04-02HouseTitle Suff Do Pass
2014-04-02HouseReferred To Appropriations
2014-04-02SenateTransmitted To House
2014-04-02SenateImmediate Release
2014-04-02SenatePassed As Amended
2014-04-02SenateAmended
2014-04-02SenateTitle Suff Do Pass
2014-04-02SenateReferred To Appropriations

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback