MS HR99 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-28 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-28 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A Resolution Commending And Congratulating The Hartfield Academy Hawks Boys Basketball Team Upon Winning The Mais Class Aaa State Championship And Finishing Second In The Overall State Tournament.
Title
Hartfield Academy Hawks Boys Basketball Team; congratulate upon winning the MAIS class AAA State Championship and finishing second in overall tournament.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-28 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-03-27 | House | Immediate Release |
2017-03-27 | House | Adopted |
2017-03-26 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2017-03-25 | House | Referred To Rules |