MS HR9 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-10 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-10 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A Resolution Commending The Life And Legacy Of Randy Joseph Naylor, Sr., And Expressing Deepest Sympathy To His Family And Friends Upon His Passing.
Title
Randy J. Naylor, Sr.; commend life and legacy upon his passing.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-10 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2014-01-31 | House | Immediate Release |
2014-01-31 | House | Adopted |
2014-01-28 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2014-01-20 | House | Referred To Rules |