MS HR89 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A Resolution Commending The Life, Service And Legacy Of Dr. Milton Duane "bud" Matthews And Expressing Deepest Sympathy To His Family And Friends Upon His Passing.
Title
Dr. Milton Duane "Bud" Matthews; commend life and legacy upon his passing.
Sponsors
Rep. Philip Gunn [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-03-27 | House | Immediate Release |
2018-03-27 | House | Adopted |
2018-03-26 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2018-03-25 | House | Referred To Rules |