MS HR89 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-25 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-25 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A Resolution Commending The Life And Legacy Of Mr. Clifford F. Dance, Jr., And Expressing Deepest Sympathy To His Family And Friends Upon His Passing.
Title
Clifford F. Dance, Jr.; commend life and legacy upon his passing.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-25 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2011-03-24 | Immediate Release | |
2011-03-24 | Adopted | |
2011-03-23 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2011-03-22 | Referred To Rules |