MS HR8 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-16 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-16 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A Resolution Commending The Exceptional And Dedicated Career Of Mrs. Janie Bertrand Guice And Congratulating Her Upon The Occasion Of Her Retirement From The University Of Mississippi After 36 Years Of Distinguished Service.
Title
Mrs. Janie Bertrand Guice; commend stellar career upon the occasion of her retirement.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-16 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2013-01-15 | House | Immediate Release |
2013-01-15 | House | Adopted |
2013-01-14 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2013-01-11 | House | Referred To Rules |