MS HR63 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A Resolution Commending And Congratulating The 2023-2024 Hartfield Academy Hawkettes Dance Team For Winning The Midsouth Association Of Independent Schools (mais) Spirit Competition In Both The Medium Varsity Pom Category And The Medium Varsity Kick Category.
Title
Hartfield Academy Hawkettes Dance Team; commend for winning the MAIS Spirit Competition.
Sponsors
Rep. Brent Powell [R] | Rep. Lee Yancey [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2024-04-04 | House | Adopted |
2024-04-02 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2024-03-12 | House | Referred To Rules |