MS HR61 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-27 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-27 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A Resolution Commending And Congratulating Miss Asya Branch For Being Crowned Miss Usa 2020 And Extending Sincerest Wishes For Her Continued Success At The Miss Universe Pageant 2021 And In All Her Future Endeavors.
Title
Asya Branch; commend and congratulate upon being crowned Miss USA 2020.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-27 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2021-03-26 | House | Immediate Release |
2021-03-26 | House | Adopted |
2021-03-25 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2021-03-24 | House | Referred To Rules |