MS HR61 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-12 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-12 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A Resolution Commending Command Sergeant Major Brian K. Belue Upon Being The Youngest Person To Reach The Rank Of Command Sergeant Major In The Mississippi National Guard.
Title
Brian K. Belue; commend & congratulate upon achievement of Command Sergeant Major in the Mississippi National Guard.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-12 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2012-03-08 | Immediate Release | |
2012-03-08 | Adopted | |
2012-03-07 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2012-03-02 | Referred To Rules |