MS HR6 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-18 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-18 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A Resolution Declaring April 2019 As "lineman Appreciation Month" In Recognition Of The Outstanding Service Of Electrical Linemen In The State Of Mississippi And In Remembrance Of The Life And Legacy Of Mr. Jamie Neal Guin.
Title
Lineman Appreciation Month; designate April 2019 as.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-18 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-01-17 | House | Immediate Release |
2019-01-17 | House | Adopted |
2019-01-16 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2019-01-14 | House | Referred To Rules |