MS HR53 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-05 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-05 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A Resolution Congratulating Mrs. Alice Thomas-tisdale Upon Being Named The Publisher Emeritus Of The Jackson Advocate After 38 Years Of Dedicated And Meritorious Service.
Title
Alice Thomas-Tisdale; congratulate upon being named the Publisher Emeritus of the Jackson Advocate.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-05 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-03-04 | House | Immediate Release |
2020-03-04 | House | Adopted |
2020-03-02 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2020-02-17 | House | Referred To Rules |