MS HR51 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 23-6)
Status: Passed on March 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 23-6)
Status: Passed on March 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A Resolution Recognizing And Honoring Mr. Joseph Lane Steele For His Distinguished Career, Meritorious Leadership And Outstanding Service Upon The Occasion Of His 35th Year As A Firefighter With The Magee Fire Department.
Title
Joseph Lane Steele; commend his 35 years of service to the Magee Fire Department.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-05 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-04 | House | Immediate Release |
2019-03-04 | House | Adopted |
2019-02-28 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2019-02-20 | House | Referred To Rules |