MS HR5 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-12 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-12 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A Resolution Commending And Congratulating Mr. Floyd Shankerman For His Iconic Years Of Service To Clarksdale, Mississippi, As The Owner Of Shankerman's.
Title
Floyd Shankerman; commend upon iconic years of service to Clarksdale, Mississippi; as owner of Shankerman's.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-12 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2023-01-11 | House | Immediate Release |
2023-01-11 | House | Adopted |
2023-01-10 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2023-01-04 | House | Referred To Rules |