MS HR49 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-09 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-09 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A Resolution Commending And Congratulating The Northwest Rankin High School Lady Cougars Soccer Team For Winning The Mississippi High School Activities Association Class 6a Girls Soccer State Championship.
Title
Northwest Rankin High School Lady Cougars Soccer Team; commend for winning MHSAA Class 6A Girls Soccer State Championship.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-09 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-03-08 | House | Immediate Release |
2022-03-08 | House | Adopted |
2022-03-07 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2022-03-02 | House | Referred To Rules |